This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/02/2022 at 01:41:28 (UTC).

STORM VS HSR CONSTRUCTORS

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 STORM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HSR CONSTRUCTORS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STORM COMPANIES INC

Defendants

HSR CONSTRUCTORS

RAILWORKS TRACK SYSTEMS INC

HERZOG CONTRACTING CORP

STACY WITBECK INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEMPKINS MICHAEL D

1947 Lee Rd

Winter Park, FL 32789-1834

Defendant Attorney

PASKERT JEFFREY M

100 N Tampa St Ste 3700

Tampa, FL 33602-5835

 

Court Documents

NOTICE CHANGING LAW FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS

01/26/2022: NOTICE CHANGING LAW FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS

NOTICE

10/29/2021: NOTICE

AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/24/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

03/01/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

04/02/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/24/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/24/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

04/16/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/08/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE CHANGING LAW FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#16) ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#15) ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#14) ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docket(#12) MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S188215; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: FISHBACK DOMINICK BENNETT SPEP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S188215; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: FISHBACK DOMINICK BENNETT SPEP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less