This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/03/2022 at 17:01:19 (UTC).

STONEY JACOBS VS A SEELEY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 STONEY JACOBS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against A SEELEY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACOBS STONEY J

Defendants

SEELEY ALEXANDER J

Rockledge, FL 32955-6707

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

RUDD RYAN P

20 N Orange Ave Ste 1600

Orlando, FL 32801-4624

GOSS ADY A

20 N Orange Ave Ste 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

KIRSHEMAN JEFFREY W

200 E Robinson St Ste 800

Orlando, FL 32801-1993

HABER MERRYL S

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/24/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/23/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

02/17/2022: MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

02/03/2022: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/13/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION RETURNED SERVED

12/09/2021: SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

12/07/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

REQUEST FOR COPIES

12/06/2021: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

12/03/2021: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCR:ORD TO SHOW CAUSE CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCAL:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • Docket(#73) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDER TO APPEAR AND/OR SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) ORDER TO APPEAR AND/OR SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#1) CERTIFIED COPY OF FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED ORIG PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN RUDD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADY GOSS