This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/16/2020 at 16:17:58 (UTC).

STEVE FARMER VS GARY PATROVICH

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 STEVE FARMER filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against GARY PATROVICH. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FARMER DEATRA

EASTERN PROPERTIES

FARMER STEVE

Defendants

CONRAD BERGMANN INC

1875 S Patrick Dr

Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937-4386

PATROVICH GARY SR

Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937-4386

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLUB GEOFFREY

512 N Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32935-6838

 

Court Documents

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

11/01/2017: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

09/21/2017: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/18/2017: DENIAL OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND COUNTER CLAIM

07/28/2017: ANSWER AND COUNTER CLAIM

MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT DUE

07/27/2017: MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT DUE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

07/27/2017: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

07/27/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

07/25/2017: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/25/2017: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

10/20/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

ORDER

10/03/2017: ORDER

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

09/28/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

09/28/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

SUBPOENA ISSUED BY CLERK

09/21/2017: SUBPOENA ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION TO DISMISS

08/18/2017: MOTION TO DISMISS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

07/26/2017: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/25/2017: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

07/25/2017: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketCOUNTERCLAIM DISP UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 10:15 AM; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketASM: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EASTERN PROPERTY DEVELOPMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLUB GEOFFREY