This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 11:59:24 (UTC).

STC VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 STC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STC MANAGEMENT LLC

ROBINSON LARAYAH

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Florida Chief Financial Officer, 200 East Gaines Street Post Office Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRINCE MICHAEL RYAN

7171 N Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33487-1612

Defendant Attorneys

LEVASSEUR RICHARD

1000 Legion Pl Ste 850

Orlando, FL 32801-1000

SEYMOUR RONALD

1555 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd Ste 1000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-2328

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY

06/08/2020: STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/08/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/02/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/28/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/26/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/26/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/14/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

COVER SHEET

02/12/2020: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/12/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

02/12/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • Docket(#20) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2020
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docket(#15) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docket(#14) MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#12) INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S164252; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GED LAWYERS LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT <100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less