This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 07:26:23 (UTC).

STC MANAGEMENT VS GEICO GENERA

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 STC MANAGEMENT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AYALLA OFELIA

STC MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Chief Financial Officer, 200 East Gaine St, Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRINCE MICHAEL RYAN

7171 N Federal Hwy

Boca Raton, FL 33487-1612

Defendant Attorney

LEVASSEUR RICHARD

1000 Legion Pl Ste 850

Orlando, FL 32801-1000

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/02/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES

01/02/2020: NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/22/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

JOINT STIPULATION

09/18/2019: JOINT STIPULATION

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

09/18/2019: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/11/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

09/11/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

08/28/2019: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

08/19/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/16/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

08/16/2019: COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

08/16/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#20) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docket(#17) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • Docket(#16) MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S150005; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 1501-2500; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GED LAWYERS LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $1501-$2500; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less