This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/10/2020 at 09:33:04 (UTC).

STATE FARM VS JACQUELINE ROGER

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 STATE FARM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JACQUELINE ROGER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORINA SAM FRANK

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ROGERS SAMUEL RODNEY

Melbourne, FL 32935-2645

ROGERS JACQUELINE

Melbourne, FL 32935-2645

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NODARSE-BUSCEMI ODALYS

Po Box 941330

Miami, FL 33194-1330

Defendant Attorney

DEMING LAUREN

1000 Legion Place Suite 850

Orlando, FL 32801-

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

04/01/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

02/04/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

02/03/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/24/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

DISCLOSURE

12/24/2019: DISCLOSURE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/24/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

12/20/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

12/20/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/02/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/02/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 02/03/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 1001 < 1500; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less