This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/23/2023 at 02:14:06 (UTC).

ST JOHNS VS HOME DEPOT

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 ST JOHNS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ST JOHNS INSURANCE COMPANY

SHOTWELL WHITNEY

Defendants

HOME DEPOT INC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

321 HOMES INC

4165 Dow Rd Ste 22

Melbourne, FL 32934-9266

ALLEN CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISE LLC

7025 Marvin Ave

Cocoa, FL 32927-2339

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN TYLER D

1540 International Pkwy Ste 2000

Lake Mary, FL 32746-5096

Defendant Attorneys

FELCE ALEJANDRO

111 N Orange Ave Suite 2000

Orlando, FL 32801

RIGELSKY MICHAEL J

800 N Magnolia Ave Ste 450

Orlando, FL 32803-3247

JOHNSON ROBERT NATHAN

255 S Orange Ave Ste 900

Orlando, FL 32801-3454

WONDER CHANTEL C

100 Se 2Nd St Ste 3900

Miami, FL 33131-2153

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

03/23/2022: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/15/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/15/2022: ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

09/15/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ORDER EXTENDING TIME

08/16/2022: ORDER EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE

07/08/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

07/08/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/01/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

03/23/2022: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

CORRESPONDENCE

03/23/2022: CORRESPONDENCE

CORRESPONDENCE

03/21/2022: CORRESPONDENCE

CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

06/01/2022: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

05/26/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

05/26/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

05/02/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/13/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/13/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/24/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Matter Type: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Result: CR:ORD TO SHOW CAUSE CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCR:ORD TO SHOW CAUSE CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCAL:ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • Docket(#48) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: OTHER NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: OTHER NEGLIGENCE; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less