This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/16/2020 at 10:43:16 (UTC).

SPORTS IMAGING VS PROGRESSIVE

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 SPORTS IMAGING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WINDSOR IMAGING

MORRIS WILLIAM

SPORTS IMAGING CENTERS LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines St, Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

BULLIS BRIDGET J

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

01/16/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/15/2020: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/13/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/13/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COVER SHEET

12/13/2019: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/13/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/13/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/13/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 19-40-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S159331; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S159331; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less