This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/18/2020 at 11:06:10 (UTC).

SPINE VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 SPINE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COLLINS NATALIE

SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O State Of Florida Chief Financial Officer, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-0300

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

BULLIS BRIDGET J

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

05/19/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/19/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/19/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/20/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

02/19/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/19/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/19/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/19/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 20-01-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less