This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 06:24:08 (UTC).

SPINE ORTHO VS DIRECT GENERAL

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 SPINE ORTHO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GASKIN TERRANCE

SPINE ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS CENTRAL FLORIDA LLC

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

ALSAFEER ISAM J

1990 W New Haven Ave Ste 303

Melbourne, FL 32904-3924

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

03/04/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

03/04/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/29/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/31/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/29/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/29/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/29/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163015; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163015; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less