This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 09:31:04 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND VS KISHA L MORSE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 SECOND ROUND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KISHA L MORSE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC

Defendant

MORSE KISHA L

Melbourne, FL 32904-4911

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE ASHLEY L

5801 Ulmerton Rd Ste 201

Clearwater, FL 33760-3951

 

Court Documents

JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER

02/13/2020: JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

01/20/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/02/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

11/25/2019: COVER SHEET

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/25/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: MEDIATION HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCR: MEDIATION HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158289; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158289; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 1001 < 1500; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 02/13/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 1001 < 1500; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less