This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/23/2020 at 06:33:20 (UTC).

SECOND ROUND VS JULIAN MAUJER

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 SECOND ROUND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JULIAN MAUJER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SECOND ROUND SUB LLC

Defendant

MAUJER JULIAN D

Cocoa, FL 32927-4224

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WALKER SHARON

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408-1611

MOEHLE KRISTINA B

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408-1611

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

06/05/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/05/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

06/01/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

JUDICIAL DIRECTIVE (ACTION) ORDER

04/28/2020: JUDICIAL DIRECTIVE (ACTION) ORDER

JUDICIAL DIRECTIVE (ACTION) ORDER

03/27/2020: JUDICIAL DIRECTIVE (ACTION) ORDER

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

03/16/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

02/21/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/13/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/11/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

02/11/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S164132; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 1001 < 1500; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ABC LEGAL SERVICES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 1001 - 1500; Disposition Date: 06/05/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 1001 < 1500; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less