This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 08:54:00 (UTC).

SEAMUS ROWE VS FEDNAT

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 SEAMUS ROWE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FEDNAT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES H EARP. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES H EARP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROWE SEAMUS

Defendant

FEDNAT INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St, Insurance Commissioner State Florida Process Section

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALIK IMRAN EBRAHIM

1061 Maitland Center Commons Blvd

Maitland, FL 32751-7435

Defendant Attorney

EBERST AIMEE MARIE

101 Se Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Stuart, FL 34994-3043

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

04/08/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

12/30/2019: MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/30/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/10/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/04/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/02/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/02/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/02/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/02/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158585; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: IMRAN EBRAHIM MALIK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158585; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: IMRAN EBRAHIM MALIK

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: INSURANCE CLAIM; Disposition Date: 04/08/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less