This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/15/2022 at 18:14:33 (UTC).

S SCHRADER VS ALL SMOOTH LAWN

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 S SCHRADER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALL SMOOTH LAWN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHRADER SCHUYLER MYLES

Melbourne, FL 32935

Defendants

ALL SMOOTH LAWN MAINTENANCE LANDSCAPING INC

15890 Sw 200Th St

Miami, FL 33187-2902

RODRIGUEZ TOM

Homestead, FL 33033-1041

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIELDING JOHN D

325 Fifth Avenue Suite 100

Indialantic, FL 32903-4226

Defendant Attorney

CALVO-PAQUETTE LOURDES MARIA

390 N Orange Avenue Suite 1700

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/13/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/13/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/13/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

08/09/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/05/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/03/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/19/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/19/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/19/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/19/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/18/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/18/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

07/18/2022: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

07/18/2022: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

06/30/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

06/13/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALL SMOOTH LAWN MAINTENANCE AND LANDSCAPING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIELDING JOHN D