This case was last updated from Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/22/2023 at 06:06:52 (UTC).

S LOWE VS COWAN SYSTEMS LLC

Case Summary

On 02/04/2023 S LOWE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COWAN SYSTEMS LLC. This case was filed in Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Brevard County Courthouse - Melbourne Branch located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT BLAUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT BLAUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOWE SHANIA

TEEFEY TYMBERLYN

Defendants

COWAN SYSTEMS LLC

RAKOWIECKI SAMUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDENBERG ERIC STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN JENNIFER ANDERSON

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/04/2023: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/08/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/08/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/08/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

02/10/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/10/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

COVER SHEET

02/04/2023: COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/10/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/10/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/26/2023

HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 03:45 PM; Judge: SCOTT BLAUE; Matter Type: HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketCAL:HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) NOTICE OF HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

Docket(#26) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

Docket(#25) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

Docket(#23) MOTION TO COMPEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: SCOTT BLAUE; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
02/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2023

ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2023

DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2023

DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2023

DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2023

DocketJudge History; Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: SCOTT BLAUE; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less