This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/03/2023 at 23:03:35 (UTC).

S AMATRUDI VS STATE FARM INSUR

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 S AMATRUDI filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM INSUR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMATRUDI SAMUEL

AMATRUDI ALEXIS

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRUBLE MATTHEW G

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH BURKS A

BURNETTE W BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/02/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/20/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/31/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/01/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

04/17/2023: NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

PRIVILEGE LOG

03/27/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/30/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/20/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2023
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SUBPOENA ISSUED BY ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • Docket(#29) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • Docket(#28) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • Docket(#24) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) PRIVILEGE LOG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less