This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/30/2021 at 18:41:24 (UTC).

S ADAMS VS IMPORTED CAR STORE

Case Summary

On 10/13/2009 S ADAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IMPORTED CAR STORE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE W. MAXWELL III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE W. MAXWELL III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADAMS SCOTT

ADAMS ELIZABETH

ADAMS JAMES

ADAMS SHAWN J

ADAMS ERIKA

Defendants

DINGMAN GROUP INC

C/O William E Dingman, 1051 West Webster Ave

Winter Park, FL 32789

JAB REAL ESTATE COMPANY INC

174 W Comstock Ave Ste 102, C/O John M Hofmann Registered Agent

Winter Park, FL 32789-4347

IMPORTED CAR STORE INC

1051 W Webster Ave, C/0 William E Dingman Registered Agent

Winter Park, FL 32789-3033

T V S INC

Volvo Store Co William E Dingman Registered Agent, 1051 W Webster Ave

Winter Park, FL 32789-3099

VOLVO STORE

NEAL JASON ANDREW

Palm Bay, FL 32907-7104

DINGMAN WILLIAM E

Winter Park, FL 32789-3033

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUMPHRIES CELENE H

1111 W Cass St Ste 200

Tampa, FL 33606-1308

CLIFTON WILLIAM R

4948 Corfu Dr

Cocoa, FL 32926-5027

ZWIBEL ELIZABETH ANN

1234 E 5Th Ave

Tampa, FL 33605-4904

ROMANO JOHN F

1005 Lake Ave

Lake Worth, FL 33460-3709

MCGREAL JERRY D

3402 Russ Pl

Melbourne, FL 32940-8646

Defendant Attorneys

TARLOW DAVID M

2400 E Commerical Boulevard Suite 520

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308-

WALBOLT SYLVIA H

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33607-5780

GUMMER JADE M

255 S Orange Ave Ste 900

Orlando, FL 32801-3454

THIELHELM ROBERT W JR

P O Box 112

Orlando, FL 32802-

 

Court Documents

MOTION IN LIMINE

08/20/2012: MOTION IN LIMINE

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

09/24/2012: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

08/24/2012: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

MOTION IN LIMINE

08/31/2012: MOTION IN LIMINE

MOTION IN LIMINE

08/27/2012: MOTION IN LIMINE

MOTION IN LIMINE

09/07/2012: MOTION IN LIMINE

MOTION IN LIMINE

08/29/2012: MOTION IN LIMINE

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

09/06/2012: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

08/24/2012: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2014
  • Docket(#433) RECEIPT OF EXHIBITS AND/OR EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2014
  • Docket(#432) RECEIPT OF EXHIBITS AND/OR EVIDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • Docket(#431) NOTICE OF INTENT BY CLERK TO DESTROY EXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#430) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#429) ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#428) JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 02:45 PM; Judge: GEORGE W. MAXWELL III; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#427) ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
631 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: 2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2009
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER NEGLIGENCE; Judge: ROBERT A WOHN JR; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TVS, Inc. d/b/a Deep South Freight is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALBOLT SYLVIA H

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thielhelm, Robert William, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TARLOW, DAVID MICHAEL