This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 17:42:59 (UTC).

S A DAVID VS S MARE

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 S A DAVID filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against S MARE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAVID SORANA

Rockledge, FL 32955-8074

Respondent

MARE SZABOLCS

Melbourne, FL 32935-5784

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB; Amount: -5.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB FEE; Amount: -4.51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: 10.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • Docket(#17) FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Disposition Date: 05/08/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketRSGN: DOM TO COUNTY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: RSGN: DOM TO COUNTY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K ERLENBACH; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less