This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 04/17/2020 at 09:06:03 (UTC).

ROYAL PALMS VS CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 10/06/2017 ROYAL PALMS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JEFFREY MAHL and GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JEFFREY MAHL

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROYAL PALMS SENIOR APARTMENTS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

PREMIER PAINT DRYWALL INC

GENERAL SHELL CONTRACTORS LLC

SUPERIOR TRIM DOOR INC

VELOCITY PAINTING INC

FORUM CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC

CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES INC

TRUSSWAY LTD

MORTON CONCRETE INC

BH-FFS LLC

BRADCORP FLORIDA II LLC

CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES INC TENNESSEE

A M BUFALO ENTERPRISE INC

FORUM ARCHITECTURE INTERIOR DESIGN INC

ATRIUM WINDOWS DOORS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMALL EVAN

201 E Pine St Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801-2764

PICATAGGIO MEGAN A

201 E Pine St Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801-2719

Defendant Attorneys

CHILDERS MICHAEL J

201 N Hogan St Ste 400

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4220

SHAHADY THOMAS R

100 Ne 3Rd Ave, Ste 850

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

SMITH CLARK W

1615 Forum Pl #500

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

MILLER THOMAS B

800 Se 3Rd Avenue Suite 201

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

TAGGART BARBARA J

1550 Southern Blvd Ste 300

West Palm Beach, FL 33406-3240

HIGGINS HUGH D

801 Third Street South

St Petersburg, FL 33701

WILLIAMS J ANDREW

200 E Robinson St Ste 510

Orlando, FL 32801-1956

EYERMAN TERESA

2699 Lee Road Suite 120

Winter Park, FL 32789-

SCHULMAN BETH ANN

800 North Magnolia Avenue Suitr 430

Orlando, FL 32801

KENNEDY SANDRA D

200 E Robinson St Ste 510

Orlando, FL 32801-1956

WALL DOUGLAS IVAN

255 S Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801-3424

PASKERT JEFFREY M

P O Box 1438

Tampa, FL 33601

SNYDER PATRICK J

4686 Sunbeam Rd

Jacksonville, FL 32257-6189

PITTMAN JAYNE A

Conroy Simberg Ganon Krevans & Abel Pa, Two South Orange Avenue Suite 300

Orlando, FL 32801-2637

WHITE FRED P 3

Po Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247-7718

MILNE MICHAEL E

545 Delaney Ave Ste 8 Fl 2

Orlando, FL 32801-3866

PHILLIPS RYAN C

390 North Orange Avenue Suite 2300

Orlando, FL 32801

BULL STEPHEN M

4767 New Broad St

Orlando, FL 32814-6405

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/02/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

APPEAL TRANSMITTAL LETTER

07/06/2018: APPEAL TRANSMITTAL LETTER

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/26/2018: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

02/20/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/27/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

07/16/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

SUPREME COURT ORDER

12/24/2019: SUPREME COURT ORDER

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/06/2017: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION RETURNED SERVED

08/24/2018: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION RETURNED SERVED

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: PRIVATE CIRCUIT CIV MEDIATION; Matter Type: PRIVATE CIRCUIT CIV MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRIVATE CIRCUIT MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:30 AM; Judge: PRIVATE CIRCUIT CIV MEDIATION; Matter Type: PRIVATE CIRCUIT CIV MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRIVATE CIRCUIT MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#184) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#183) CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#182) MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#181) ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:00 AM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:15 AM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
220 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2017
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S102144; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: $17.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MEGAN PICATAGGIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: B192410; Party: P 1; Memo: BY MAIL; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: $2.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BALL JANIK LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONSTRUCTION DEFECT; Judge: JEFFREY MAHL; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORUM CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BRADCORP FLORIDA II LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Atrium Windows & Doors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES, INC. is a litigant