This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/09/2020 at 11:45:54 (UTC).

ROYAL OAK VS ROYAL OAK GOLF

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 ROYAL OAK filed an Other lawsuit against ROYAL OAK GOLF. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROYAL OAK MINISTRIES INC

Defendant

ROYAL OAK GOLF CLUB INC

C/O Neil Mahase, 8750 State Road 46

Mims, FL 32754-6013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHN MICHAEL

482 N Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32935

Defendant Attorney

MCGARRELL THOMAS P

5205 Babcock St Ne Ste 1

Palm Bay, FL 32905-4698

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/31/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

03/31/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/10/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

03/04/2020: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/31/2020: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketDSB: REFUND; Amount: 42.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163048; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MICHAEL KAHN PS TRUST ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163049; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: REFUND; Amount: $42.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MICHAEL KAHN PS TRUST ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163048; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MICHAEL KAHN PS TRUST ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163048; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE; Amount: $5.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MICHAEL KAHN PS TRUST ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: LIS PENDENS - ADDTL PAGE; Amount: 28.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: LIS PENDENS - FIRST PAGE; Amount: 5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less