This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/09/2020 at 08:50:18 (UTC).

ROXANNE LONG VS SECURITY

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 ROXANNE LONG filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES H EARP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES H EARP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONG ROXANNE

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St, Chief Financial Officer

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAPF GRANT W

2790 Sunset Point Rd

Clearwater, FL 33759-1503

Defendant Attorney

PASQUALE CHRISTOPHER D

6751 N Federal Highway #400

Boca Raton, FL 33487

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

03/24/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/28/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/11/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/27/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

01/09/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PRIVILEGE LOG

01/09/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PRIVILEGE LOG

12/02/2019: PRIVILEGE LOG

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/21/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/18/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/13/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

11/05/2019: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

10/14/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/11/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/11/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/11/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/11/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • Docket(#27) MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docket(#23) MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less