Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/16/2020 at 23:07:07 (UTC).

ROSELLA BROWN VS STATE FARM

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 ROSELLA BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN ROSELLA

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer, Ra, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32301-4201

MIGHTY EMMA JEAN

Melbourne, FL 32901-6040

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDBAEK CHRISTIAN A

222 N Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32935-6762

Defendant Attorneys

BRAMS CRAIG L

Mimi L Smith & Associates

Orlando, FL 32801-

POPRAWSKI SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

301 Se Ocean Blvd Ste 205

Stuart, FL 34994-2209

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

05/08/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

04/30/2019: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT COMPLETE AGREEMENT OR SETTLED

04/13/2018: MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT COMPLETE AGREEMENT OR SETTLED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY OR PARTIES

04/10/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY OR PARTIES

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

04/10/2018: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

04/04/2018: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

04/03/2018: CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

04/02/2018: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

02/12/2018: CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

01/09/2018: CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/20/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

09/13/2017: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/13/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/15/2017: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/15/2017: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

08/15/2017: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Docket(#44) MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketTO BE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE PAULK AS OF 01-01-2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT COMPLETE AGREEMENT OR SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PARTY OR PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Disposition Date: 04/30/2019; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-MEDIATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: JEFFREY MAHL; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINDBAEK CHRISTIAN A