This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 11/29/2020 at 23:55:22 (UTC).

RONALD HARP VS BRANDON HARP

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 RONALD HARP filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BRANDON HARP. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARP RONALD

Rockledge, FL 32955

Respondents

HARP BRANDON RAYSHAWN DOC Number - E54054

Orange Park, FL 32065-7341

WILLIAMS CLARISSA DOMINIQUE

Titusville, FL 32780-9999

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SANDERS-RANDALL MICHAEL

3270 Suntree Blvd Ste 204

Melbourne, FL 32940-7505

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER, NOTICE, AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#11) CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#8) ATTESTATION REGARDING READING ADMINISTRATIVE ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENT EDUCATION COURSE (COPE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S178415; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SANDERS RANDALL RI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S178415; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SANDERS RANDALL RI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER DOMESTIC RELATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER FAMILY COURT; Judge: C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER, NOTICE, AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#4) UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT (UCCJA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#3) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less