This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/11/2020 at 06:22:36 (UTC).

ROLAND T ASCHER

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 ROLAND T ASCHER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID E. SILVERMAN and GEORGE B. TURNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

GEORGE B. TURNER

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

ASCHER HEIDI S

Naugatuck, CT 06770-4774

Decedents

ASCHER ROLAND T

Barefoot Bay, FL 32976

ASCHER ROLAND TILLY

Barefoot Bay, FL 32976

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

COTTON NICOLE M

709 Washington St

Sebastian, FL 32958-4153

Other Attorneys

NICOLE M COTTON PA

709 Washington St

Sebastian, FL 32958-4153

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#17) CONFIDENTIAL INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE TO CREDITORS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#11) LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (PR) RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketASM: FORMAL ADMIN $60K - $100K; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • Docket(#4) RECEIPT FOR SAFEKEEPING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: SAFEKEEPING WILL; Disposition Date: 11/25/2019; Disposition Description: ADMIN PROCEEDING DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNON SRS FILING DISPO UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) DEATH CERTIFICATE - FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#1) WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNON SRS FILING ACTION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less