This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/16/2022 at 00:07:56 (UTC).

ROCKLEDGE VS MATTHEW C MCNEELY

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 ROCKLEDGE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MATTHEW C MCNEELY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROCKLEDGE HMA LLC

WUESTHOFF MEDICAL CENTER ROCKLEDGE

Defendant

MCNEELY MATTHEW C

Cocoa, FL 32927-9213

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE TROY R

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/22/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/22/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/23/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: MICHELLE A BAKER; User: wmb63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S209047; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 139023580; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LOTANE TROY R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S209047; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 139023580; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LOTANE TROY R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT $501 - $1000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WUESTHOFF MEDICAL CENTER-ROCKLEDGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R