This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/26/2020 at 09:32:42 (UTC).

ROBERT G GIBBS

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 ROBERT G GIBBS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

FLOIT KATHERINE A

Sycamore, IL 60178-2758

Decedents

GIBBS ROBERT GENE

Dekalb, IL 60115-4403

GIBBS ROBERT G

Dekalb, IL 60115-4403

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

ALLENDER STEVEN C

719 Garden St

Titusville, FL 32796-3410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • Docket(#36) STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#35) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#34) REPORT OF DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docket(#33) MOTION OR PETITION TO DISCHARGE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#32) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docket(#31) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docket(#30) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docket(#29) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docket(#28) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • Docket(#27) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: FORMAL ADMIN 60000 < 100000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: FORMAL ADMIN $60K - $100K; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#6) DEATH CERTIFICATE - NON- FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#5) EXEMPLIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN ADMINISTRATION DOCUMENT(S) RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONICALLY FILED (E-FILED) WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less