This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/02/2020 at 11:45:04 (UTC).

ROBERT BARROWS VS USAA GENERAL

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 ROBERT BARROWS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USAA GENERAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARROWS ROBERT

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

C O Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra, 200 East Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMERO LISBAN

250 N Orange Ave Suite 605

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

JACOBS NINA

1201 S Orlando Ave Ste 400

Winter Park, FL 32789-7107

SIMON MICHAEL

1201 S Orlando Avenue Suite 400

Winter Park, FL 32789

BOCK RANDY A

1201 S Orlando Ave Ste 400

Winter Park, FL 7192

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/17/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/04/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/27/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/26/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

03/06/2020: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/26/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

02/24/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/24/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/24/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/24/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER EXTENDING TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docket(#9) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: INSURANCE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less