This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 09:00:00 (UTC).

RICHARD W C WESTRA ET UX

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 RICHARD W C WESTRA ET UX was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KURT ERLENBACH and BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KURT ERLENBACH

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WESTRA COURTNEY NICHOLE

Melbourne, FL 32901-1315

WESTRA RICHARD WILLIAM CLIN

Melbourne, FL 32901-1315

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • Docket(#15) DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB; Amount: -5.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB FEE; Amount: -4.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: 10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#14) FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:15 AM; Judge: KURT ERLENBACH; Matter Type: SIMPLIFIED DOM HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • Docket(#13) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketASM: SDOM FILING FEE; Amount: 414.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#7) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#1) CERTIFICATE OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less