This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/30/2022 at 01:21:30 (UTC).

RICHARD FOREE VS TITAN FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 RICHARD FOREE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TITAN FLORIDA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOREE RICHARD T

Defendants

TITAN FLORIDA LLC

1201 Hays St

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2699

ROBICHAUD ALBERT L

Cocoa, FL 32922-5442

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALPIZAR O JOHN

1528 Palm Bay Rd Ne

Palm Bay, FL 32905-3843

ALPIZAR SCOTT D

1528 Palm Bay Rd

Palm Bay, FL 32905-3843

Defendant Attorney

BRADLEY MEGHAN K

208 N Laura St Fl 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3518

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

03/16/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/28/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

02/21/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

02/04/2022: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/28/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

01/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

01/26/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/26/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

01/26/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/21/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

01/08/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

01/03/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/04/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

05/03/2022: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

05/02/2022: REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

05/02/2022: REQUEST FOR COPIES

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

04/28/2022: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

04/20/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 10:30 AM; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#60) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Titan Florida LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALPIZAR SCOTT D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALPIZAR O JOHN