This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 17:46:00 (UTC).

RICHARD BISHOP VS NINA BISHOP

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 RICHARD BISHOP filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NINA BISHOP. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are J ATKIN-GM K ERLENBACH and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

J ATKIN-GM K ERLENBACH

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BISHOP RICHARD KEITH

Palm Bay, FL 32907-2845

Respondents

BISHOP NINA ANN

Sebring, FL 33870-8465

MERCURE BISHOP NINA ANN

Sebring, FL 33870-8465

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB; Amount: -5.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB FEE; Amount: -4.51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketPMT: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: 10.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2021
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docket(#20) COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: JUDITH E ATKIN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docket(#21) FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH SUPPORT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#6) SUPPORT GUIDELINE WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#5) UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT (UCCJA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: M NABERHAUS-GM K ERLENBACH; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less