This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/06/2022 at 11:51:31 (UTC).

REVERSE MORT VS W C KILBOURNE

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 REVERSE MORT filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against W C KILBOURNE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

KILBOURNE WILLIAM C ESTATE

1034 Villa Dr

Melbourne, FL 32940

UNKNOWN HEIRS

Melbourne, FL 32940

UNITED STATES AMERICA

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602-4774

SECRETARY HOUSING URBAN DEVELOPMENT

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602-4774

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS JONATHAN

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487-2853

 

Court Documents

DISCLAIMER

03/18/2022: DISCLAIMER

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/11/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/11/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/10/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/10/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

01/28/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

COMPLIANCE OF NOTICE WITH PAYMENT DUE

01/24/2022: COMPLIANCE OF NOTICE WITH PAYMENT DUE

CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

01/19/2022: CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

01/20/2022: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCLAIMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S212963; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 142544936; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MEISELS JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S212867; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JONATHAN IAN MEISELS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S212867; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: LIS PENDENS TWO PAGES; Amount: $9.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JONATHAN IAN MEISELS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S212867; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT:FCL >50,000; Amount: $906.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: JONATHAN IAN MEISELS

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SECRETARY HOUSING URBAN DEVELOPMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan