This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/28/2022 at 10:25:33 (UTC).

REVERSE MORT VS M RAMIREZ EST

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 REVERSE MORT filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against M RAMIREZ EST. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS

Melbourne, FL 32901-5846

RAMIREZ MARY ESTATE

2500 Plantation Dr

Melbourne, FL 32901-5846

RAMIREZ LOURDES

Melbourne, FL 32901-5840

UNITED STATES AMERICA

C/O Us Attorney'S Office Middle District Of Fl, 400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602-4774

SECRETARY HOUSING URBAN DEVELOPMENT

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200, C/O Robert E Oneill

Tampa, FL 33602-4774

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARASOLER TRACY

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487-2853

Defendant Attorney

RUDY JOHN F 3

400 N Tampa St Ste 3200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE

05/11/2022: CERTIFICATE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

05/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

05/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

05/13/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

05/11/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

05/11/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/11/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/11/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/11/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S223265; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 151180574; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $18.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: STARASOLER TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: 18.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S220759; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 149355844; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $30.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: STARASOLER TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S220759; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 149355844; Event Description: PMT:FCL >50,000 < 250,000; Amount: $906.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: STARASOLER TRACY

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-HOMESTEAD $50001-$249999; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECRETARY HOUSING URBAN DEVELOPMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Starasoler, Tracy, ESQ.