This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/03/2023 at 00:32:05 (UTC).

RESTORX VS UNITED PROPERTY

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 RESTORX filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RESTORX RESTORATION LLC

MALDONADO ROSA

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra, Po Box 6200 Service Process Section

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUBOFF KENNETH R

680 Ne 127Th St

North Miami, FL 33161-4879

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/18/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/18/2022: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/18/2022: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/18/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COVER SHEET

11/18/2022: COVER SHEET

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/21/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingCourt Schedule; Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; User: agr03

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234563; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161525943; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DUBOFF KENNETH R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234563; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161525943; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: DUBOFF KENNETH R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 5001 - 8000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#6) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESTORX RESTORATION LLC A/A/O MALINIO PERICLES is a litigant

Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duboff, Kenneth