This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/26/2023 at 16:00:43 (UTC).

RESTORATION 1 VS UNITED

Case Summary

On 10/03/2022 RESTORATION 1 filed an Other lawsuit against UNITED. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RESTORATION 1 OF WEST PALM BEACH INC

SWABY CARLTON

SWABY CARMEN

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGES OTTO

Defendant Attorney

DAVID COREY M

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/03/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/03/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/03/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

10/07/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

12/14/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

01/26/2023: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/14/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PRIVILEGE LOG

02/16/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE FOR MANDATORY STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PRIVILEGE LOG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Docket(#15) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#14) ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 03:00 PM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: COUNTY CIVIL $8001 - $15000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less