This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/28/2023 at 01:01:02 (UTC).

RESTORATION 1 VS CITIZENS

Case Summary

On 10/03/2022 RESTORATION 1 filed an Other lawsuit against CITIZENS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RESTORATION 1 OF WEST PALM BEACH INC

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CULZAC CANDACE D

BERGES OTTO

Defendant Attorney

SAAD CHRISTINA M

 

Court Documents

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

11/18/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

10/06/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/03/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/03/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/03/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ORDER SETTING HEARING

05/17/2023: ORDER SETTING HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/08/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO TRANSFER

04/27/2023: MOTION TO TRANSFER

MOTION TO TRANSFER

04/27/2023: MOTION TO TRANSFER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/29/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/07/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

10/03/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

02/20/2023: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

02/14/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

01/05/2023: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

01/02/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/08/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/05/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • HearingCourt Schedule; Court Time: 10:45 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KELLY INGRAM; User: mec84

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER SETTING HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • Docket(#21) MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION TO TRANSFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • Docket(#19) MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION TO TRANSFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less