This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 10:59:01 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK VS R S THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 REGIONS BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R S THOMPSON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES H EARP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES H EARP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK

Defendant

THOMPSON RICHARD STANFORD

Indialantic, FL 32903-2534

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURKE PAUL W

235 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1900

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

12/26/2019: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/09/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158245; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PAUL W BURKE ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158245; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PAUL W BURKE ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less