This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 12/30/2021 at 12:15:39 (UTC).

RECHE THOMAS NOBLE J

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 RECHE THOMAS NOBLE J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORGAN LAUR REINMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORGAN LAUR REINMAN

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioners

SHINE REBECCA

Titusville, FL 32780-7447

THE BROOME LAW FIRM

915 S Washington Ave

Titusville, FL 32780-8404

Decedent

NOBLE RECHE THOMAS JR

Titusville, FL 32780-2862

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

FIELD SHANNAN

The Law Office Of Shannan M Field Pa1135 S Washington Ave Ste A

Titusville, FL 32780-8401

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • Docket(#21) AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • Docket(#20) STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#18) CONFIDENTIAL INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#17) PROOF OF PUBLICATION REGARDING NOTICE TO CREDITORS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • Docket(#16) PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#14) FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#6) OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • Docket(#4) PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION NO FEDERAL TAX RETURN DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: MORGAN LAUR REINMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: SAFEKEEPING WILL; Disposition Date: 06/07/2016; Disposition Description: ADMIN PROCEEDING DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketNON SRS FILING DISPO UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • DocketNON SRS FILING ACTION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Docket(#2) RECEIPT FOR SAFEKEEPING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Docket(#1) WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BROOME LAW FIRM PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIELD SHANNAN