This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/26/2023 at 11:12:24 (UTC).

RAY SCHONK VS KEITH GELZINIS

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 RAY SCHONK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEITH GELZINIS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHONK RAYMOND

Defendants

GELZINIS KEITH

Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937-2719

GEICO INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2413

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENTINI MICHAEL R

7335 W Sand Lake Rd Ste 300

Orlando, FL 32819-5539

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/02/2023: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/02/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/02/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/02/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/02/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/02/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/02/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/10/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/10/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/16/2023: AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/16/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/16/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/16/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/20/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/20/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/20/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S240539; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 166973860; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $20.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LENTINI MICHAEL R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#18) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#17) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2023
  • Docket(#7) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Docket(#6) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less