This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 11:10:59 (UTC).

RANDAL MICHAEL WROTEN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 RANDAL MICHAEL WROTEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

WROTEN MARK K

Livonia, MI 48150-3437

USAA SAVINGS BANK

C/0 Dcm Services, 7601 Penn Ave S Ste A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

Decedent

WROTEN RANDAL MICHAEL

Melbourne, FL 32935-7228

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

FREEMAN TERRENCE N II

3001 Pga Blvd Ste 305

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410-2896

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket(#22) ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE (PR) RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket(#21) LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:30 AM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#18) PETITION TO PROBATE A LOST OR DESTROYED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#17) DEATH CERTIFICATE - FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#16) DEATH CERTIFICATE - FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#15) DEATH CERTIFICATE - FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: FORMAL ADMIN < $25000; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#7) PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#6) POWER OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONICALLY FILED (E-FILED) WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) DEATH CERTIFICATE - FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#1) OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less