This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 00:25:29 (UTC).

R WILLIAMS VS A EDWARDS

Case Summary

On 08/09/2019 R WILLIAMS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against A EDWARDS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JENNIFER TAYLOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JENNIFER TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS RONALD DOC Number - E56998

Titusville, FL 32796-1278

Respondent

EDWARDS ASHLEY

Titusville, FL 32796-1849

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CRUTCHFIELD GREGORY A

5575 Us Highway 1

Rockledge, FL 32955-5624

Respondent Attorney

STEELE ANDREW C

1625 S Washington Ave Suite D

Titusville, FL 32780

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • Docket(#18) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:15 AM; Judge: JENNIFER TAYLOR; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 03:30 PM; Judge: JENNIFER TAYLOR; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 03:00 PM; Judge: JENNIFER TAYLOR; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HRG CONTINUED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCR: HRG CONTINUED BY PLF

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketASM: PATERNITY; Amount: 301.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: -409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketRSGN: AO CONSOLIDATE DR TO DP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Docket(#1) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT PAT; Judge: JENNIFER TAYLOR; Description: RSGN: AO CONSOLIDATE DR TO DP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT PAT; Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less