This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/26/2023 at 08:05:55 (UTC).

R JONES VS CITIZENS PROPERTY

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 R JONES filed an Other lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JONES ROBERT M

JONES BELINDA G

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

200 E Gaines St, Florida Chief Financial Officer Registered Agent

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALTMAN ALEXIS

925 S Federal Hwy Ste 600

Boca Raton, FL 33432-6145

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/15/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/15/2022: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/15/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/17/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COVER SHEET

11/15/2022: COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/15/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

12/20/2022: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/24/2023: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/09/2023: AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/01/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 01:45 PM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Docket(#16) ORDER EXTENDING TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less