This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/07/2020 at 08:14:58 (UTC).

R J CAHILL VS B L WEIGLE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 R J CAHILL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against B L WEIGLE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is C ROBERTS-GM L CASTALDI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

C ROBERTS-GM L CASTALDI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAHILL RYAN JACOB

Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937-4174

Respondent

WEIGLE BRIANA LYNN

Melbourne, FL 32935-2074

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#27) MOTION TO ESTABLISH CHILD SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket(#26) MOTION FOR TEMPORARY SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket(#25) PATERNITY TEST RESULTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#24) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#23) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#21) UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT (UCCJA)- (Count 1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#20) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING JUVENILE DEPENDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#18) CIVIL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS (FOUND INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docket(#19) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#6) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#1) SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM:VISITATION-GPNT/SUPERVISED; Amount: 301.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER FAMILY COURT; Judge: C ROBERTS-GM L CASTALDI; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less