This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/10/2020 at 21:15:09 (UTC).

PREMIER VS SUNRISE LANDING

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 PREMIER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SUNRISE LANDING. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PREMIER ENVIRONMENTAL SOLUTIONS LLC

Defendant

SUNRISE LANDING CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION BREVARD COUNTY INC

3490 N Highway 1 Ste 103

Cocoa, FL 32926-8724

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIES G PHILIP J

700 N Wickham Road Suite 107

Melbourne, FL 32935

Defendant Attorney

EPPS ALEXANDRIA N

1900 Summit Tower Blvd Ste 400

Orlando, FL 32810-5912

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/11/2020: RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/10/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/09/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163366; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GEORGE P ZIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163366; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GEORGE P ZIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less