This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/26/2020 at 07:04:12 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO VS VANESSA COLON

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 PORTFOLIO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VANESSA COLON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

COLON VANESSA

Palm Bay, FL 32909-4750

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSEN JOSEPH F

Pollack & Rosen P A, 806 Douglas Road South Tower Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

01/15/2020: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/03/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/26/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

12/09/2019: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/27/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/21/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

10/30/2019: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

10/25/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/23/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

10/14/2019: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

10/08/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

10/08/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/08/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

10/08/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less