This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/26/2021 at 09:18:05 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO VS KAREN HENNESSEY

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 PORTFOLIO filed an Other lawsuit against KAREN HENNESSEY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID E. SILVERMAN, RHONDA E. BABB and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

RHONDA E. BABB

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

HENNESSEY KAREN

Melbourne, FL 32904-7329

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE RACQUEL A

700 N Hurstbourne Pkwy Ste 200

Louisville, KY 40222-5395

 

Court Documents

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

07/07/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/23/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/21/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

06/21/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2021
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S198005; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 129162562; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WHITE RACQUEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S198005; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 129162562; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WHITE RACQUEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: COUNTY CIVIL $8001 - $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, RACQUEL ANN