This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/18/2021 at 00:08:56 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO VS JUDITH RIVERA

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 PORTFOLIO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JUDITH RIVERA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID E. SILVERMAN, KELLY INGRAM and RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

KELLY INGRAM

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

RIVERA JUDITH

Melbourne, FL 32935-3967

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE RACQUEL A

700 N Hurstbourne Pkwy Ste 200

Louisville, KY 40222-5395

Defendant Attorney

JACOBS CHRISTOPHER J

601 21St St Ste 300

Vero Beach, FL 32960-0860

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/14/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

06/30/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

06/24/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/21/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/21/2021: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2021
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S198046; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 129162704; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WHITE RACQUEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S198046; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 129162704; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WHITE RACQUEL A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 2501 - 5000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITE, RACQUEL ANN