This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 00:39:26 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO VS ASHLEY CLARK

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 PORTFOLIO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ASHLEY CLARK. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

CLARK ASHLEY

Melbourne, FL 32901-7202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEAL BROOKE E

Po Box 23200

Louisville, KY 40223-0200

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

07/20/2020: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

07/20/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/20/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT ENTERED

07/17/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

04/06/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

02/13/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/05/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163294; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RICHARD A ALPHIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163294; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RICHARD A ALPHIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less