Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 07/16/2021 at 13:06:33 (UTC).

PAMELA DAVIS VS LIBERTY

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 PAMELA DAVIS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LIBERTY. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS PAMELA

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines Street, C/O Chief Financial Officer Registered Agent

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONNELL DERRICK R

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-2604

Defendant Attorneys

COSBY JEFFREY C

301 Se Ocean Blvd, Ste 205

Stuart, FL 34994

MCLAUGHLIN BRYAN D

301 Se Ocean Blvd Ste 205

Stuart, FL 34994-2209

STRUDWICK ANDREA

9130 S Dadeland Blvd Ste 1520

Miami, FL 33156-7868

HENNES CHRISTINE R

4350 W Cypress St Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33607-4181

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/30/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/23/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/23/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COVER SHEET

12/23/2020: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

06/04/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/04/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

06/03/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/21/2021: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/21/2021: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/17/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/17/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/11/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/11/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

02/16/2021: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/11/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/20/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

01/07/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/07/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • Docket(#52) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docket(#43) SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S184939; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: CONNELL DERRICK R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: INSURANCE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where THE FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant