This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/21/2021 at 23:57:46 (UTC).

P POLDERVAART VS ADAMS HOMES

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 P POLDERVAART filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against ADAMS HOMES. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POLDERVAART LAUREEN ANN

Titusville, FL 32780-3265

POLDERVAART PIETER HENDRIX

Titusville, FL 32780-3265

Defendants

ADAMS HOMES NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC

C/O William Bryan Adams Ra, 3000 Gulf Breeze Pkwy

Gulf Breeze, FL 32563-5623

EPIFANIO ONTIVEROS CONSTRUCTION LLC

704 N 22Nd St

Haines City, FL 33844-4516

HRC PAINTING INC

270 Hammock Rd Se

Palm Bay, FL 32909-8848

DM ENTERPRISES BREVARD INC

4011 Digital Light Dr Ste 101

Melbourne, FL 32934-9251

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURNETT JOSHUA E

200 N Pierce St

Tampa, FL 33602-5020

Defendant Attorneys

LINDQUIST DARA L

300 S Orange Ave Ste 1400

Orlando, FL 32801-3380

BULLINGER JASON F

Po Box 1873

Oralndo, FL 32802

BARTO HILL SUZANNE

P O Box 1873

Orland, FL 32802-1873

FLEGIEL MICHAEL A

214 South Lucerne Circle East Suite 201

Orlando, FL 32801

HALSTEAD TRAVIS J

Po Box 1549

Orlando, FL 32802-1549

OLSEN GARRETT MICHAEL

1900 Summit Tower Blvd Ste 400

Orlando, FL 32810-5912

ALHADEFF SETH V

2 Alhambra Plz Ste 1110

Coral Gables, FL 33134-5249

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/22/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/22/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

02/02/2021: NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/20/2021: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/25/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/22/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/25/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/19/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/15/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONSTRUCTION DEFECT; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HRC PAINTING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARTO HILL SUZANNE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL A FLEGIEL, ESQ