This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/21/2023 at 00:14:18 (UTC).

P PELLERIN VS B SHOENWIESNER

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 P PELLERIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against B SHOENWIESNER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PELLERIN PATRICIA A

Defendants

SHOENWIESNER BENJAMIN S

SHOENWIESNER ROBERT S

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BATES WILLIAM DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

HOFFMAN JENNIFER ANDERSON

HOPKINS SHERI LYNN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

11/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/11/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/11/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/11/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/11/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/11/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/11/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/30/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/30/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/30/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/03/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/27/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

02/21/2023: CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

02/21/2023: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/17/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/17/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2023
  • HearingCourt Schedule; Court Time: 02:00 PM; Event Description: CAL:PRIVATE CIRCUIT MEDIATION; Court Room Description: AS ORDERED BY THE COURT; User: mec84

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • DocketCAL:PRIVATE CIRCUIT MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • Docket(#62) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Docket(#61) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Docket(#60) CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Docket(#59) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Docket(#55) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 30.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less